Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José (de Bolaños) Calzado, O.F.M. Disc. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Nisibis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1680BornBolaños de Calatrava, Spain
17 May 170424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Friars Minor
24 Nov 173858.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nisibis
1739²58.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nisibis
7 Apr 176180.9DiedTitular Archbishop of Nisibis

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José (de Bolaños) Calzado:
Archbishop José (de Bolaños) Calzado O.F.M. Disc. (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Nisibis

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 59, Number 266
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 47
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 311

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015