Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Bokhold (Bokholt)

Deceased

Bishop of Lübeck


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1463²BornHamburg
19 Jun 152360.5SelectedBishop of Lübeck, Germany
31 Aug 152360.7ConfirmedBishop of Lübeck, Germany
6 Mar 152461.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lübeck, Germany
15 Mar 153572.2DiedBishop of Lübeck, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Bokhold (Bokholt):
Bishop Heinrich Bokhold (Bokholt) (died ) Bishop of Lübeck

  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 228
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,912

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 11 Jan 2014; data: 11 Jan 2014