Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Boccamazza

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Aug 1278AppointedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
22 Dec 1285Elevated to Cardinal
22 Dec 1285AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
Aug 1286ResignedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
10 Aug 1309DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Boccamazza:
Cardinal Giovanni Boccamazza (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

  • a cardinal for 23.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Dec 1285

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 5 Jan 2014