Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Gabriel de Blauza

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite)

Note/Previous Titular See: (from bish/Aleppin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1625¹BornBlaouza, Lebanon
1663²38.0Ordained BishopBishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria
12 May 170479.4SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
27 Apr 170580.3ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
31 Oct 170580.8DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel de Blauza:
Patriarch Gabriel de Blauza (died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a bishop for 42.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013