Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gaetano Cardinal Bisleti

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of Seminaries and Universities

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

President of the Pontifical Biblical Commission


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1856Born
20 Sep 187822.5Ordained PriestPriest of Veroli, Italy
27 Nov 191155.6Elevated to Cardinal
30 Nov 191155.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
1 Dec 191559.6AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Seminaries and Universities
17 Dec 192872.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
27 Oct 193276.6AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Biblical Commission
30 Aug 193781.4DiedPrefect of the Congregation of Seminaries and Universities

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Bisleti
Gaetano Cardinal Bisleti (born , died ) Prefect of Seminaries and Universities

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVeroli

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a cardinal for 25.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast