Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lelio Cardinal Biscia

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1575Born
19 Jan 162650.5Elevated to Cardinal
9 Feb 162650.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
19 Dec 163358.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
9 Feb 163761.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
19 Nov 163863.4DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo

MicroData Summary for Lelio Biscia
Lelio Cardinal Biscia (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 12.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Jan 1626

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast