Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Louis Billot, S.J. †

Deceased

Priest of Society of Jesus

Titular See: (Resigned Cardinalate)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1846Born
22 May 186923.3Ordained PriestPriest of Blois, France
25 Nov 186923.8EnteredPriest of Society of Jesus
2 Feb 188337.0Final VowsPriest of Society of Jesus
27 Nov 191165.8Elevated to Cardinal
30 Nov 191165.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
21 Sep 192781.6ResignedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
18 Dec 193185.9DiedPriest of Society of Jesus

MicroData Summary for Louis Billot
Father Louis Billot S.J. (born , died ) Priest of Society of Jesus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSierck-les-Bains, Diocese of Metz, France
Ordained PriestBlois, Diocese of Blois, France
Death PlaceJesuit Novitiate, Galloro
Buried Place (Original)Jesuit Chapel, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 62.5 years
  • a cardinal for 15.8 years (Resigned)

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 Nov 1911

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jul 2018

Quantcast