Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Deacon Konrad von Bibra

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Würzburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1490Born
1 Jul 154050.5SelectedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
27 Aug 154050.6ConfirmedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
4 Aug 154454.5DiedBishop-Elect of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Konrad von Bibra (VIAF: 18019947)
Deacon Konrad von Bibra (born 1490, died ) Bishop-Elect of Würzburg

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Germania Sacra: Neue Folge, Volume 13, Page 100
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,540
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 208

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast