Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Francesco Biancolella

Deceased

Bishop of Nicotera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1604BornAversa
29 Oct 162824.2Ordained PriestPriest
22 Aug 166763.0AppointedBishop of Nicotera, Italy
5 Feb 1669³64.5DiedBishop of Nicotera, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco Biancolella:
Bishop Giovanni Francesco Biancolella (born , died ) Bishop of Nicotera

  • a priest for 40.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 260
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1667, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 7 Apr 2015