Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Umberto Cardinal Betti, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Rector Emeritus of the Pontifical Lateran University

Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia

Priest of Order of Friars Minor


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1922Born
2 Aug 193816.4First VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
31 Dec 194321.8Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
6 Apr 194624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
1991²68.8AppointedRector of the Pontifical Lateran University
1995²72.8RetiredRector of the Pontifical Lateran University
24 Nov 200785.7Elevated to Cardinal
24 Nov 200785.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
1 Apr 200987.0DiedRector Emeritus of the Pontifical Lateran University

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Umberto Betti (VIAF: 7384844)
Umberto Cardinal Betti O.F.M. (born , died ) Rector Emeritus of Pontifical Lateran University

EventPlace
Birth PlacePieve San Stefano, Diocese of Arezzo, Italy
Death PlaceInfirmary, San Francesco, Convent, Fiesole, Diocese of Fiesole, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Franciscan Shrine of La Verna, Cemetery

  • a priest for 62.9 years
  • a cardinal for 1.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 13 Nov 2018

Quantcast