Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre Cardinal Bérulle, C.O.I. †

Deceased

Superior General of Société de l’Oratoire de Jésus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1575BornCastle of Sérilly, France
5 Jun 159924.3Ordained PriestPriest of Société de l’Oratoire de Jésus
10 May 161338.2AppointedSuperior General of Société de l’Oratoire de Jésus
30 Aug 162752.5Elevated to Cardinal
2 Oct 162954.6DiedSuperior General of Société de l’Oratoire de Jésus

MicroData Summary for Pierre Bérulle:
Pierre Cardinal Bérulle C.O.I. (born , died ) Superior General of Société de l’Oratoire de Jésus

  • a priest for 30.3 years
  • a cardinal for 2.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Aug 1627

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015