Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pompilio Berlingieri

Deceased

Bishop of Bisignano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1662BornCrotone
21 Jan 170340.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
4 Feb 170340.7Ordained PriestPriest
17 May 170643.9AppointedBishop of Bisignano, Italy
25 May 170644.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bisignano, Italy
Mar 1721³58.7DiedBishop of Bisignano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pompilio Berlingieri:
Bishop Pompilio Berlingieri (born , died Mar 1721) Bishop of Bisignano

  • a priest for 18.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 120
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1706, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 19 Jun 2015