Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Costanzo Bergna, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prefect of Dessiť, Ethiopia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1884Born
14 Mar 190823.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
28 Jul 193752.7AppointedPrefect of Dessiť, Ethiopia
12 Dec 194157.1DiedPrefect of Dessiť, Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Costanzo Bergna
Father Costanzo Bergna O.F.M. (born , died ) Prefect of Dessiť

  • a priest for 33.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast