Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerhard von Berg

Deceased

Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
27 May 1364AppointedBishop of Verden, Germany
20 Aug 1365AppointedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
15 Nov 1398DiedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany

MicroData Summary for Gerhard von Berg (VIAF: 69737500)
Bishop Gerhard von Berg (died ) Bishop of Hildesheim

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 277, and Page 521

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast