Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Berardi

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1380²BornCorcumello
20 Oct 142141.8AppointedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
18 Dec 143960.0Elevated to Cardinal
8 Jan 144060.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
7 Mar 144464.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
21 Jan 144969.1DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Berardi:
Cardinal Giovanni Berardi (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

  • a cardinal for 9.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1439

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 25 Dec 2013