Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bentivenga Cardinal de Bentivenghi, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Todi, Italy

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

Major Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1230¹Born
18 Dec 127646.9AppointedBishop of Todi, Italy
12 Mar 127848.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
12 Mar 127848.1Elevated to Cardinal
26 Sep 127949.7AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
25 Mar 128959.2DiedCardinal-Bishop of Albano

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bentivenga de Bentivenghi
Bentivenga Cardinal de Bentivenghi O.F.M. (born 1230, died ) Bishop of Todi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAquasparta, Diocese of Todi
Death PlaceTodi, Diocese of Todi
Buried Place (Original)S. Fortunato, Church, Todi, Diocese of Todi

  • a cardinal for 11.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1278
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 501

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 7 Apr 2020

Quantcast