Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jons Bengtsson

Deceased

Archbishop of Uppsala, Sweden


Events

DateEventTitle
1448¹SelectedArchbishop of Uppsala, Sweden
30 Jun 1448Ordained BishopArchbishop of Uppsala, Sweden
28 Feb 1449ConfirmedArchbishop of Uppsala, Sweden
15 Dec 1467DiedArchbishop of Uppsala, Sweden

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jons Bengtsson
Archbishop Jons Bengtsson (died ) Archbishop of Uppsala

EventPlace
Ordained BishopUppsala, Archdiocese of Uppsala

  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 260
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,733
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,045

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast