Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Beck

Deceased

Bishop of Lincoln, England


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Mar 1341SelectedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
7 Jul 1342Ordained BishopBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
2 Feb 1347DiedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Beck:
Bishop Thomas Beck (died ) Bishop of Lincoln

  • a bishop for 4.6 years
  • Principal Consecrator:
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 306
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 75
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013