Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Karl Josef Cardinal Becker, S.J. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Giuliano Martire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1928Born
13 Apr 194819.9ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
31 Jul 195830.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
18 Feb 201283.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giuliano Martire
18 Feb 201283.8Elevated to Cardinal
22 Apr 201284.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Giuliano Martire
10 Feb 201586.8DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Giuliano Martire

MicroData Summary for Karl Josef Becker (VIAF: 52763108)
Karl Josef Cardinal Becker S.J. (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Giuliano Martire

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKöln, Germany

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a cardinal for 2.9 years

Source(s):
  • card: Bollettino, 6 Jan 2012
  • 1g31: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2012
  • i: Bollettino, 18 Apr 2012
  • d: CB, 10 Feb 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast