Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antony Beck

Deceased

Bishop of Norwich, England


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Mar 1337AppointedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
30 Mar 1337Ordained BishopBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
19 Dec 1343DiedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Antony Beck:
Bishop Antony Beck (died ) Bishop of Norwich

  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 371
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 74
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 464

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013