Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Philipp Wilhelm Cardinal von Bayern

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Regensburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1576Born
14 Jul 15792.8SelectedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
13 Jun 15803.7ConfirmedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
18 Dec 159620.2Elevated to Cardinal
28 May 159821.6DiedBishop-Elect of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Philipp Wilhelm von Bayern (VIAF: 88906121)
Philipp Wilhelm Cardinal von Bayern (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Regensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMünich
Death PlaceCastle, Dachau
Buried Place (Original)Tomb of his ancestors, S. Maria, Church, Münich

  • a cardinal for 1.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1596
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1579
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 282

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018