Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Bateman

Deceased

Bishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Jan 1344AppointedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
23 May 1344Ordained BishopBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
6 Jan 1355DiedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Bateman
Bishop William Bateman (died ) Bishop of Norwich

  • a bishop for 10.6 years
  • Principal Consecrator:
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 371
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 75
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 464

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018