Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pasquale Teodoro Basta

Deceased

Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1711³BornMonteparano
22 Dec 174231.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Mar 174331.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jan 174836.7AppointedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
4 Feb 174836.7Ordained BishopBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
27 Dec 176554.6DiedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pasquale Teodoro Basta:
Bishop Pasquale Teodoro Basta (born , died ) Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla

  • a priest for 22.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1757
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 285
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015