Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
16 Jan 1969 | Born | ||
21 Dec 1997 | 28.9 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Institut du Clergé Patriarcal de Bzommar |
17 May 2022 | 53.3 | Appointed | Apostolic Administrator of Eastern Europe {Europa Orientale} (Armenian) |
(WikiData: Q112065981)
Father
Mikael
Bassalé
I.C.P.B.
(born )
Apostolic Administrator
of Eastern Europe {Europa Orientale}
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Beirut, Archdiocese of Beirut {Bairut} (Armenian), Lebanon |
Ordained Priest | Beirut, Archdiocese of Beirut {Bairut} (Armenian), Lebanon |
Please contact the Father through the Ordinariate of Eastern Europe {Europa Orientale} (Armenian).
|
|
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠