Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cesare Cardinal Baronio, C.O. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1538BornSora, Italy
20 May 156122.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
27 May 156425.7Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
5 Jun 159657.8Elevated to Cardinal
21 Jun 159657.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
30 Jun 160768.8DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo

MicroData Summary for Cesare Baronio:
Cardinal Cesare Baronio C.O. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a cardinal for 11.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Jun 1596

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013