Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Cardinal de Bardi

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria degli Angeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1685BornFlorence, Italy
9 Sep 174358.6Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 174358.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
13 Dec 174358.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
15 Dec 174358.9Ordained PriestPriest of Sant’Adriano al Foro
28 May 175368.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria degli Angeli
11 Mar 176176.1DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria degli Angeli

MicroData Summary for Girolamo de Bardi:
Cardinal Girolamo de Bardi (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria degli Angeli

  • a priest for 17.2 years
  • a cardinal for 17.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Sep 1743

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013