Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Ermolao Barbaro (Jr)

Deceased

Patriarch of Aquileia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1454Born
6 Mar 149136.7AppointedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
2 May 149338.9DiedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ermolao Barbaro (Jr) (VIAF: 54942062)
Patriarch Ermolao Barbaro (Jr) (born , died ) Patriarch of Aquileia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 92
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1491, Number 19*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 31 Dec 2018

Quantcast