Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Angelo Cardinal Barbarigo

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1350¹BornVenice
Dec 1383²33.9AppointedBishop of Kisamos, Greece
21 Sep 140656.7AppointedBishop of Verona, Italy
19 Sep 140858.7Elevated to Cardinal
19 Sep 140858.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
1409¹59.0ResignedBishop of Verona, Italy
4 Jul 141565.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
16 Aug 141868.6DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Barbarigo:
Cardinal Angelo Barbarigo (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede

  • a cardinal for 9.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Sep 1408

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 29 Dec 2013