Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Mario de Leon Baltazar, O.P. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Batanes and the Babuyan Islands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1926BornBayombong
14 Sep 194418.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
8 Mar 195225.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
18 Nov 196640.2AppointedPrelate of Batanes and the Babuyan Islands, Philippines
7 Jan 196740.3InstalledPrelate of Batanes and the Babuyan Islands, Philippines
199568.3ResignedPrelate of Batanes and the Babuyan Islands, Philippines
9 Jul 201285.9DiedPrelate Emeritus of Batanes and the Babuyan Islands, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Mario de Leon Baltazar:
Priest Mario de Leon Baltazar O.P. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Batanes and the Babuyan Islands

  • a priest for 60.3 years

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013