Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Balduino de Balduinis

Deceased

Bishop of Aversa, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Dec 1550AppointedBishop of Mariana, France
30 Mar 1554AppointedBishop of Aversa, Italy
18 Apr 1582DiedBishop of Aversa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Balduino de Balduinis
Bishop Balduino de Balduinis (died ) Bishop of Aversa

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 126, and Page 235
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1550, Number 48*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast