Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg von Baden

Deceased

Bishop of Metz, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1436¹Born
11 Jan 145721.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Metz, France
2 Jul 145923.5AppointedBishop of Metz, France
11 Oct 148448.7DiedBishop of Metz, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georg von Baden
Bishop Georg von Baden (born 1436, died ) Bishop of Metz

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 190
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1459, Number 17*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast