Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bernhard Gustav Cardinal von Baden-Durlach, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1631Born
24 Aug 167139.6Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
22 Feb 167240.1Elevated to Cardinal
19 Oct 167644.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
26 Dec 167746.0DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna

MicroData Summary for Bernhard Gustav von Baden-Durlach (VIAF: 27870530)
Bernhard Gustav Cardinal von Baden-Durlach O.S.B. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKarlsburg, Germany

  • a cardinal for 6.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Aug 1671

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018