Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francois Bachaud (Bachodi)

Deceased

Bishop of Genève {Geneva}

Apostolic Nuncio to Savoy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1501¹BornVarey
27 Jun 155655.4AppointedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
3 Jun 156059.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
1 Jul 156867.5DiedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francois Bachaud (Bachodi)
Bishop Francois Bachaud (Bachodi) (born 1501, died ) Bishop of Genève {Geneva}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 201
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 252

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 26 Sep 2016