Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis de Ayllón

Deceased

Bishop of Ceuta, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1623Born
24 Feb 168460.4SelectedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
5 Jun 168460.6ConfirmedBishop of Ceuta, Spain

MicroData Summary for Luis de Ayllón
Bishop Luis de Ayllón (born ) Bishop of Ceuta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGranada

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 354
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 226, Number 1,401
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast