Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Matteo Avanian, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan), Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1608¹Born
1638¹30.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
14 May 166860.3AppointedArchbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan), Armenia
24 May 166860.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan), Armenia
14 Jul 167466.5DiedArchbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan), Armenia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matteo Avanian
Archbishop Matteo Avanian O.P. (born 1608, died ) Archbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAbarana

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 281
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,957
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,668, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast