Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Autelitano

Deceased

Bishop of Nusco, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1800Born
29 Aug 184949.0SelectedBishop of Nusco, Italy
28 Sep 184949.1ConfirmedBishop of Nusco, Italy
4 Nov 184949.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nusco, Italy
11 Jan 185453.4DiedBishop of Nusco, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Autelitano
Bishop Giuseppe Autelitano (born , died ) Bishop of Nusco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBova

  • a bishop for 4.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 421
  • ob: CB, 22 Jun 2013
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,729
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast