Catholic-Hierarchy DC

(Layman) Albrecht von Austria (Österreich)

Deceased

Former Archbishop-Elect of Toledo, Spain

Titular See: (did not receive any of the sacred orders)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1559Born
3 Mar 157717.3Elevated to Cardinal
12 Feb 158020.2InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
7 Nov 159434.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Toledo, Spain
7 Nov 159434.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippi
12 Nov 159435.0SucceededArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
31 Jul 159838.7ResignedArchbishop-Elect of Toledo, Spain
31 Jul 159838.7ResignedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
13 Jul 162161.6DiedFormer Archbishop-Elect of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Albrecht von Austria (Österreich) (VIAF: 268175280)
(Layman) Albrecht von Austria (Österreich) (born , died ) Former Archbishop-Elect of Toledo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWiener Neustadt, Diocese of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
Death PlaceBrussels
Buried Place (Original)St-Michel et Ste-Gudule, Church, Brussels

  • a cardinal for 21.4 years (Resigned)

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 3 Mar 1577
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 279
  • b: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1500, Page 247, Number 3
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1594

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018