Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Aussem

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Halmiros


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1616¹Born
19 Oct 167660.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
19 Oct 167660.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Halmiros
10 Jan 167761.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Halmiros
24 Nov 167963.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Aussem (VIAF: 6919203)
Bishop Paul Aussem (born 1616, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKöln

  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 80
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast