Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Oliver Pugoy Aro, M.S.P.

Superior Emeritus of Tokelau, Pacific (Oceania)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1961 Born
25 Jul 199634.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mission Society of the Philippines
2 Jan 199735.2Ordained PriestPriest of Mission Society of the Philippines
6 May 201149.5AppointedSuperior of Tokelau, Pacific (Oceania)
2 Oct 201149.9InstalledSuperior of Tokelau, Pacific (Oceania)
2015¹53.2ResignedSuperior of Tokelau, Pacific (Oceania)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Oliver Pugoy Aro
Father Oliver Pugoy Aro M.S.P. (born ) Superior Emeritus of Tokelau

EventPlace
Birth PlacePagadian City, Philippines
Ordained PriestBlessed Sacrament, Church, Cebu, Archdiocese of Cebu, Philippines

Please contact the Father through the Mission "Sui Iuris" of Tokelau.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • ab: Annuario Pontificio Variazioni, Year 2011, Number 8
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2012, Page 1,070
  • mn: CB, 1 Aug 2017
  • r: Annuario Pontificio Variazioni, Year 2018, Number 17
  • b: AM, 11 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 30 Sep 2019

Quantcast