Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Armellini Pantalassi de’ Medici

Deceased

Archbishop of Taranto, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1470Born
1 Jul 151746.9Elevated to Cardinal
6 Jul 151746.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
19 Nov 151747.3AppointedAdministrator of Gerace, Italy
6 Jun 151948.8ResignedAdministrator of Gerace, Italy
22 Nov 152353.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
15 Dec 152555.4AppointedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
8 Jan 152857.4DiedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Armellini Pantalassi de’ Medici (VIAF: 2460632)
Francesco Cardinal Armellini Pantalassi de’ Medici (born , died ) Archbishop of Taranto

EventPlace
Birth PlacePerugia
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 10.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jul 1517
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 209, and Page 308
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1525, Number 36*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Jun 2018

Quantcast