Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Arrighi

Deceased

Bishop of Montepulciano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1660Born
27 May 168424.3Ordained PriestPriest
1 Dec 171050.8AppointedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
Sep 1726³66.5DiedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Arrighi
Bishop Francesco Maria Arrighi (born , died Sep 1726) Bishop of Montepulciano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze

  • a priest for 42.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,726
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 275
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,710, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast