Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Aresti de Dovara, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Alep [Beroea, Halab], Syria


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Jul 1645AppointedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab], Syria
13 Aug 1645Ordained BishopArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab], Syria
1650¹ResignedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab], Syria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Aresti de Dovara
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Aresti de Dovara O.F.M. Obs. , Archbishop Emeritus of Alep [Beroea, Halab]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSt. Cosma in Trastevere, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 37
  • c34: AT, 10 Feb 2017
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,280

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Apr 2017