Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro de Aragón

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1527Born
14 Jan 157750.0AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
4 May 158457.3AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
15 Apr 159265.3AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
21 Dec 159771.0DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Aragón:
Bishop Pedro de Aragón (died ) Bishop of Lérida

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013