Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolf von Anhalt-Zerbst

Deceased

Bishop of Merseburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1458Born
1490¹31.2Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jul 150748.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Merseburg, Germany
5 Mar 151455.3SucceededBishop of Merseburg, Germany
2 Jul 151455.7Ordained BishopBishop of Merseburg, Germany
23 Mar 152667.4DiedBishop of Merseburg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Adolf von Anhalt-Zerbst (VIAF: 47195279)
Bishop Adolf von Anhalt-Zerbst (born , died ) Bishop of Merseburg

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 242
  • b/c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,589
  • b/c3: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1514, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 31 May 2018

Quantcast