Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nicolò Maria Cardinal Antonelli

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1698Born
24 Sep 175961.2Elevated to Cardinal
19 Nov 175961.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
25 Sep 176769.2DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo

MicroData Summary for Nicolò Maria Antonelli (VIAF: 34447235)
Nicolò Maria Cardinal Antonelli (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePergola, Italy

  • a cardinal for 8.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Sep 1759

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast