Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Cambrai

Titular Bishop of Sidon


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Jul 1447AppointedTitular Bishop of Dora
10 Apr 1448AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cambrai, France
10 Apr 1448AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidon
21 Apr 1448Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sidon

MicroData Summary for Antoine :
Bishop Antoine Auxiliary Bishop of Cambrai

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 236, and Page 145
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,766

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013