Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Angelo Cardinal d’Anna de Sommariva, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1340¹BornLodi
17 Dec 138445.0Elevated to Cardinal
Jan 1385³45.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Lucia in Septisolio
May 1396³56.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
23 Sep 141272.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
21 Jul 142888.6DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo d’Anna de Sommariva:
Cardinal Angelo d’Anna de Sommariva O.S.B. (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

  • a cardinal for 43.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Dec 1384

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 29 Dec 2013