Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro (de Santiago) Anglada Sánchez, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1590BornJaca
30 Jan 164049.9AppointedBishop of Solsona, Spain
13 Mar 164050.0Ordained BishopBishop of Solsona, Spain
14 Nov 164454.7AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
30 May 165060.2DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Pedro (de Santiago) Anglada Sánchez:
Bishop Pedro (de Santiago) Anglada Sánchez O.A.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Lérida

  • a bishop for 10.2 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,415
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 144, and Page 208
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 169, Number 1,060
  • bd: CB, 17 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 21 Jul 2014