Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andre

Deceased

Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Sep 1316AppointedBishop of Terni, Italy
20 Apr 1319AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
25 Nov 1319Ordained BishopBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
1326¹DiedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andre
Bishop Andre (died 1326) Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for 6.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 478, and Page 285
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,841

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast