Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marco Antonio Cardinal Amulio

Deceased

Bishop of Rieti, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1506¹Born
26 Feb 156155.1Elevated to Cardinal
10 Mar 156155.1InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Marcello
17 Mar 156155.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
23 Nov 156256.8AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
17 Mar 157266.2DiedBishop of Rieti, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marco Antonio Amulio (VIAF: 67286466)
Marco Antonio Cardinal Amulio (born 1506, died ) Bishop of Rieti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Sacristy, S. Giobbe, Church, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a cardinal for 11.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Feb 1561
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 283
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1562, Number 36*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018